  # 10 Tricks for doing Fast Math

## 10 Tricks for doing Fast Math

Mathematics has been a fear factor for students through the generations. But how do we overcome that fear? Is there really something to be afraid of? What do we do in order to win over this paranoia?

It is essential that we make the elementary concept of mathematics fundamentally clear. Then, we have ample simple and easy maths tricks for fast calculation. Learning those can make mathematical calculations feel like a cakewalk.  These are great aids and can do wonders to math-fearing kids. Whether you appear for competitive exams or Math Olympiads, it makes it all easy. Summing up, subtracting, and multiplying numbers faster than your peers can help you crack high school mathematics examinations in a hassle-free manner. What do you think the tricks are? Let us learn some of the maths tricks for fast calculation, now.

• How do you add large numbers?
• Multiplication tricks
• Discover quirky tricks for a division
• Multiplication of 9- made easy
• Explore 10 and 11 tricks
• Multiplying large numbers
• Multiplying numbers that end with 0
• Hacks of quick percentage calculation
• How to square a 2-digit number ending with 5?

### How do you add large numbers?

Adding bigger numbers can be troublesome while you take a stab at doing on your head. You are unable to derive the right answers by doing mental math. This is a simplified method wherein adding larger numbers become a piece of cake. What are those math tricks for kids? You need to convert the given numbers into multiples of ten. How do you calculate 644 + 238?

Just round them off to their nearest tens. Add up 650+ 240= 890. Now how is 650 > than 644? 650-644= 6. How is 240 > than 238? 240-238= 2. Add up the resulting figures, i.e., 6 and 2. You get 8. Now take the rounded-off number. The number is 890. Subtract 890 with 8. The resulting number is 882. Henceforth, 644+238= 882.

You can apply for online math tutor jobs. But before that, learn the mental math tricks and enhance your knowledge of Mental Maths or what is known as Vedic Maths, which helps to add, subtract, multiply and divide complex numbers at a fraction of a second. ‘Vedic’ word derives from the word ‘Veda’ which means knowledge. So as the name suggests, Vedic Maths offers a collection of sutras (formulas) that solve math problems in a jiffy.

This is the ground rule to subtract a large number from 1000. How do you derive the answer for 1000-556 using effective math tricks for kids? Subtract every digit from 9 excepting the last digit. The last digit is subtracted from 10.

The first digit of 556 is 5. Subtract 5 from 9. Or what is 9-5? The answer is 4.

The second digit of 556 is again 5. 9-5=4.

The last digit of 556 is 6. You must subtract 6 from 10. In other words, 10-6= 4.

Henceforth, 1000-556= 444. When you apply maths tricks for fast calculation, you get the logic right and can apply the same logic everywhere. The results will be surprisingly accurate every time. That is the beauty of Math. Learn Maths Online

### Quick Multiplication Tricks

For multiplying an even number by 5, there are very simple tricks you can make use of. What are those mental math tricks? What number you are planning to multiply five? Is it 5X 4?

Take the number to be multiplied by 5. The number is 4. There are two steps here to help you arrive at the result.

Cut the number by half. 4/2= 2.

Add a zero to the resulting number. The resulting number is 20. Hence, 5*4= 20.

You have a different formula when you multiply an odd number with 5. What is 5*3= You know it is 15. But let us apply the trick to arrive at the answer. The steps are given to you in a bulleted form.

• Subtract one from the number you intend to multiply with 5. 3 becomes 2.
• Now half the number that has arrived. Two becomes 1. That becomes your first digit.
• Add 5 to the last digit.
• 3*5= 15. You can apply the same formula, multiplying larger even numbers or odd numbers with 5.

### Discover Quick Multiplication Tricks for a division

These are easy steps to analyze if certain numbers are evenly divisible or not. The points related to those maths tricks for fast calculation are illustrated for you in the form of bullets.

• Any given number is evenly divisible by 10 if the number ends with a 0.
• A number is divisible by 9 when you add the digits of the given number. The resulting number must be a direct factor of 9. You take 27, for instance. 2+7=9. 9 is directly divisible by 9. Take another number. 1422. Add 14+2+2. The resulting number is 18. 18 is a multiple of 9. 9*2=18. Hence, 1422 is evenly divisible by 9.
• A number is evenly divisible by 8 if the last three digits are evenly divisible by 8. Or if the last three numbers are 000.
• A given number evenly divides with 6 when you add the digits, and the resulting number is evenly divisible by 3.
• You can say that a given number is evenly divisible by 5 when you have the number ending with 0 or 5.
• For even divisibility with 4, check if the last two digits evenly divide with 4. Else look if the number ends with a 00.
• Indeed, even the distinguishableness of 3 again is determined while you all the digits of the number. The resulting figure needs to be a multiple of 3.
• Divisibility for two holds good for numbers ending with a 0,2,4, 6, or 8.

What say, not are these maths tricks for fast calculation seem helpful? Free Video Tutorials

### Multiplication of 9- made easy

You can easily multiply the number 9 by any other number with this method. Here is the trick for getting your answers right. Suppose you have 9 X 5

What is the number you are multiplying with 9? It is 5. Subtract 1 from 5. You get 4.

Now 4 is the first digit. Subtract 4 from 9. You get 5. Thus 9*5= 45. This way, you can trick people by multiplying numbers with 9.

### Explore 10 and 11 Tricks

To multiply a number by 10 is simple and easy. You just add a zero next to the number. For example, 82 X 10= 820.

For multiplying numbers with 11, here goes the trick. What is 25 * 11? Take 2 as the first digit. And 5 is the last digit. What is the middle digit? Simple – just add 2 and 5. What is 2+5? 2+5=7. So, 25 X 11= 275.

If the numbers at the center add up to a number with two digits, insert the second number. You can add 1 to the first one. What is 88*11?’

8+1_8+8_8, which is 968. You can log on to some of the best

### Multiplying large numbers

What is 20 X 120?

You derive the answer in three simple steps.

Take the first number. This is 20. Half the first set number. You get 10.

Now, double the second set. 120 becomes 240.

Multiply the answers together. What is 10* 240? You get 2400. The answer for 20*120= 2400.

When you take up the job of a math tutor online, you can brief your students with these tips and tricks. This way, your students wouldn’t waste time on calculating numbers, percentages, etc. Hire Best Home Tutors Join Online Classes

### Multiplying Numbers that end with 0

We had seen the divisibility test for number 10. You had seen this in the earlier paragraph. You can apply the same rule while multiplying larger numbers ending with zeroes. What is 200 * 400?

The answer can arrive within 4 simple steps.

Multiply 2*4. In other words, 2 X 4= 8

Count the number of zeros in 200. These are two zeroes at the end.

Again, count the number of zeros in 400. You have two zeroes in 400 too.

Now take 8 as the first digit and add all the four (Two zeroes in 200 and two zeroes in 400) zeroes. Hence, 200 X 400= 80000

Now that you know the tricks for doing maths quickly go right ahead and start implementing them. If you are looking for additional help, do check out the video tutorials, or the study material available online at Study Spectrum. Do you know that you can even hire a tutor online to improve your mathematics skills? Register at www.studyspecturm.com today and avail of the numerous benefits it provides.

### Hacks of Quick Percentage Calculation

Do you find it difficult to get the percentage of a number? Well, it might look tricky but here are some fast calculation tricks to help you easily solve the puzzle. It is easy to understand if you can decode it in the right terms. For example, what is 6% of 336? In order to answer it, you need to follow the below method:

First, move the decimal point over by two spots from right, then 336 becomes 3.36

Next, multiply 3.36 by 6. You will get the answer as 20.16.

That is the answer to the original equation. Easy enough! Isn’t it?

### How to Square a 2-digit number ending with 5?

Finding it difficult to square a two-digit number that ends with 5? Let us help you out with maths calculation shortcuts. Try this and you no longer find it difficult to square digit a number. Take 25 as an example.

Multiply the first digit by the (same digit itself plus 1).

Put a 25 at the end

Here is the calculation-

25 squared = [2 x (2 + 1)] & 25

[2 x (2 + 1)] = 6

6 & 25 = 625

25 squared = 625

Hope, next time you find a similar equation, you solve it quickly and easily using the above mental math tricks.

Those of you having maths phobia must try these maths tricks for fast calculation and get assured results with marked improvement. Initially, it might look complex but as they say, practice makes a man perfect. So, practice is the key to achieve your goal. Once, you get a hang of it, you will do wonderfully well in your calculations. Be it any competitive exams or regular school tests, applying maths tricks for fast calculation will help you increase your speed and accuracy in maths. So, what are you waiting for? Do try the hacks today and see the maths score skyrocketing!

Feel free to use images in our website by simply providing a source link to the page they are taken from.

-- Study Spectrum

## Comments on 10 Tricks for doing Fast Math

Please keep your views respectful and not include any anchors, promotional content or obscene words in them. Such comments will be definitely removed and your IP be blocked for future purpose.

4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023
4th Jun 2023